WV HB4830 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 109, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 109, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill relates generally to training requirements for school personnel; it modifies the frequency of training from annually to upon employment and every three years thereafter, for suicide prevention awareness, child sexual abuse prevention, the county policy on harassment, intimidation or bullying, and multicultural education; requires first aid training include blood borne pathogen information; and requires those who care for, educate, or house disabled children to be trained on mandatory reporting obligations.
Title
To address the professional development of teachers.
Sponsors
Del. Christopher Toney [R] | Del. Joseph Statler [R] | Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Dana Ferrell [R] |
Del. Jeff Campbell [R] | Del. Michael Hornby [R] | Del. Todd Longanacre [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 707) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 335) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 70) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 335) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 70) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 109, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/24 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 707) |
2024-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 335) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2024-02-01 | Senate | To Education |
2024-02-01 | Senate | To Education |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-01-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 70) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-01-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-26 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-17 | House | To House Education |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-17 | House | To Education |
2024-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 2 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 2C | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5 | 15A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9F | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 8F | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |