WV HB5528 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/26/24 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/26/24 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove certain caps on renewable energy generating facilities and to remove the sunset date from this section.
Title
Relating to the renewable energy facilities program
Sponsors
Del. William Anderson [R] | Del. Mark Zatezalo [R] | Del. Scot Heckert [R] | Del. Bob Fehrenbacher [R] |
Del. Thomas Clark [R] | Del. Evan Hansen [D] | Del. Larry Rowe [D] | Del. Kayla Young [D] |
Del. John Paul Hott [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 418) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 221) (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 221) (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/26/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-26 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/26/24 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/26/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 418) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2024-02-20 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 221) |
2024-02-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | Do pass |
2024-02-08 | House | To House Energy and Manufacturing |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-08 | House | To Energy and Manufacturing |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 1o | Amended Code | Citation Text |