WV HB5565 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-28 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-28 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring the Division of Motor Vehicles to provide an identification card for eligible released inmates
Title
Relating to requiring the Division of Motor Vehicles to provide an identification card for eligible released inmates
Sponsors
Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Heather Tully [R] | Del. Kayla Young [D] |
Del. Mickey Petitto [R] | Del. Mike Pushkin [D] | Del. Sean Hornbuckle [D] | Del. Hollis Lewis [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 336) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2024-02-28 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 336) |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-27 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-27 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-12 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure |
2024-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17B | 2 | 1c | Amended Code | Citation Text |