WV HCR27 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making Grafton's Annual Memorial Day Parade the Official State Memorial Day Parade
Title
Making Grafton's Annual Memorial Day Parade the Official State Memorial Day Parade
Sponsors
Del. Amy Summers [R] | Sen. Bennett Queen [R] | Del. Danny Hamrick [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Del. Richard Iaquinta [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-16 - House - Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 125) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2018-02-19 | Senate | To Military |
2018-02-19 | Senate | To Military |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-19 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-16 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 125) |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2018-02-16 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | Be adopted |
2018-01-23 | House | To House Rules |
2018-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-23 | House | To Rules |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |