WV SB169 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-20 - Vetoed by Governor 4/7/10 - Senate Journal
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-20 - Vetoed by Governor 4/7/10 - Senate Journal
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide that the West Virginia Economic Development Authority, in developing criteria for loans to a tourism project, shall not require that any specific number of jobs are or will be created by the project, nor that any existing jobs or jobs to be created are to meet any specific compensation levels, nor that any existing jobs or jobs to be created provide any specific employee benefits.
Title
Relating to Economic Development Authority loans' criteria
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-20 | Vetoed by Governor 4/7/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-07 | Vetoed by Governor 4/7/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Vetoed by Governor 4/7/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-01 | To Governor 4/1/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 71) | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Passed House (Roll No. 358) | |
2010-03-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-13 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-11 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-10 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-10 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-03-03 | To House Finance | |
2010-03-03 | To Finance | |
2010-03-03 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-02 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-02 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) | |
2010-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-01 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-26 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-26 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-25 | Reported do pass | |
2010-01-22 | To Finance | |
2010-01-22 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2010-01-13 | To Economic Development | |
2010-01-13 | To Economic Development then Finance | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-13 | To Economic Development then Finance | |
2010-01-13 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 15 | 12b | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | 15 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=169&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |