WV SB170 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 163, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 163, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Office of Miners’ Health, Safety and Training to promulgate a legislative rule relating to Rules Governing the Safety of Those Employed in and around Quarries in West Virginia.
Title
Authorizing Bureau of Commerce promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Sen. Herb Snyder [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 51) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 51) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 508) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 507) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House rejected (Roll No. 454) (Y: 36 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 51) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 508) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 507) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House rejected (Roll No. 454) (Y: 36 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 163, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/20/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/15 |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 51) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 51) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Senate reconsidered and withdrew motion to refuse to concur |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Senate requests return of bill from House |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-13 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 508) |
2015-03-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 507) |
2015-03-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-13 | House | Amended on 3rd reading |
2015-03-13 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/13/15 |
2015-03-12 | House | Motion to reconsider rejection |
2015-03-12 | House | Motion to reconsider |
2015-03-12 | House | House rejected (Roll No. 454) |
2015-03-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-09 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 11) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 10) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2015-01-30 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2015-01-14 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-14 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Judiciary |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |