WV SB270 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 118, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 118, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Insurance Commissioner to promulgate a legislative rule relating to Provider Sponsored Networks.
Title
Authorizing Department of Revenue promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Sen. Herb Snyder [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 106) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 106) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 311) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 310) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 106) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 311) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 310) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 118, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/2/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/2/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/2/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 106) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 106) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 311) |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 310) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-04-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | To Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-03-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance then to Judiciary |
2013-02-20 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-20 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Finance then Judiciary |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |