WV SB384 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring Bureau for Medical Services seek federal waiver for 30-day waiting period for tubal ligation
Title
Requiring Bureau for Medical Services seek federal waiver for 30-day waiting period for tubal ligation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 462) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 219) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 219) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 462) |
2016-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-08 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Do pass |
2016-03-03 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-03-03 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2016-03-01 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2016-03-01 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2016-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 219) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/28/16 |
2016-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2016-01-25 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-22 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 5 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |