WV SB392 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to payment of invoices received by Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation for contract work
Title
Relating to payment of invoices received by Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation for contract work
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 91) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/7/19 |
2019-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-08 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-08 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 91) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/6/19 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |