WV SB479 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a procedure for foreign profit and nonprofit corporations to reinstate in the statutory manner provided for limited liability companies
Title
Providing procedure for foreign corporations reinstate in same manner as limited liability companies
Sponsors
Sen. Herb Snyder [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 249) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 248) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 248) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-07 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2554 (Similar To) 2013-05-15 - Chapter 176, Acts, 2013
HB2896 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - To House Finance
HB2896 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31D | 15 | 1532 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31D | 15 | 1533 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31E | 14 | 1432 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 18a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 18c | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 22 | 19a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |