WV SB509 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 9, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 9, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removing 10-day requirement Division of Labor has to inspect amusement rides and attractions
Title
Removing 10-day requirement Division of Labor has to inspect amusement rides and attractions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 372) (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 292) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 128) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 86) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 292) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 128) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 86) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 9, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/15/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/15/16 |
2016-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/9/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/9/16 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-04 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-04 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 372) |
2016-03-04 | House | Conference report received-House |
2016-03-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 292) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2016-03-03 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2016-02-25 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-02-25 | Senate | To conference |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Blair, Ferns, Snyder |
2016-02-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-24 | House | House appointed conferees: Arvon, Stansbury, White, P. |
2016-02-24 | House | House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote) |
2016-02-24 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-22 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 128) |
2016-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-20 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-18 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2016-02-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2016-02-15 | House | To Government Organization |
2016-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 86) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-02-04 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-04 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |