WV SB519 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 228, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 228, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring county emergency dispatchers complete course for telephonic cardiopulmonary resuscitation
Title
Requiring county emergency dispatchers complete course for telephonic cardiopulmonary resuscitation
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] |
Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Chandler Swope [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 462) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 175) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 175) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 228, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 462) |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-01 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-27 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-27 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-22 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-22 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2019-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 175) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-08 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2880 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - To House Political Subdivisions
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 6 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |