WV SB554 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-31 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-31 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Summary
Requiring sex offender registry fee
Title
Requiring sex offender registry fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | To House Finance | |
2009-03-31 | To Finance | |
2009-03-31 | Introduced in House | |
2009-03-30 | Ordered to House | |
2009-03-30 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) | |
2009-03-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-30 | On 3rd reading | |
2009-03-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-27 | On 2nd reading | |
2009-03-26 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-26 | On 1st reading | |
2009-03-25 | Committee substitute reported | |
2009-03-18 | To Finance | |
2009-03-18 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2009-03-12 | To Judiciary | |
2009-03-12 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2009-03-12 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-03-12 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2009-03-12 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3102 (Same As) 2009-03-12 - To House Pensions and Retirement
Subjects
Code Citations
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=554&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |