WV SB595 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to retirement credit for members of WV National Guard
Title
Relating to retirement credit for members of WV National Guard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 469) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 209) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 209) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/2016 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 469) |
2016-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-08 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-29 | House | To House Finance |
2016-02-29 | House | To Finance |
2016-02-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 209) |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-02-18 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2016-02-12 | Senate | To Pensions |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-12 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 7A | 17b | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 10 | 15c | New Code | See Bill Text |