WV SB625 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 193, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 193, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising exceptions from FOIA provided for in Aboveground Storage Tank Act
Title
Revising exceptions from FOIA provided for in Aboveground Storage Tank Act
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Chris Walters [R] |
Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 410) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 473) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 272) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 473) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 272) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 193, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/2016 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-28 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/28/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 410) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 473) |
2016-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-08 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Do pass |
2016-03-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 272) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on 1st reading 2/28/16 |
2016-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2016-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 9c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 30 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |