WV SB649 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 77, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 77, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify that senior status intermediate court judges and family judges are subject to the same per diem compensation limits as senior circuit court judges. This addresses a possible gap in code created after the creation of intermediate court of appeals and the inclusion of the family court judges in the judicial retirement system.
Title
Clarifying per diem compensation for certain judges recalled to service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 562) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 176) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 176) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 77, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/12/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 562) |
2024-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2024-02-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 176) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2024-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 10 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 9 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |