WV SB683 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to amend the definition of "alternative fuel" under the Motor Fuel Excise Tax.
Title
Amending definition of "alternative fuel" under motor fuel excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 487) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 677) (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 616) (Y: 56 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 193) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 677) (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 616) (Y: 56 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 193) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/24 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/24 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/19/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 487) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 677) |
2024-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No. 616) |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-02-22 | House | To House Energy and Manufacturing |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 193) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-02-07 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-07 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 14C | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |