WV SB72 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 69, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 69, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating Sexual Assault Victims' Bill of Rights
Title
Creating Sexual Assault Victims' Bill of Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 339) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 424) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 36) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 424) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 36) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 69, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/11/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/11/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/11/19 |
2019-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 339) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 424) |
2019-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-04 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-02 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-01-31 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-31 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 36) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |