WV SB760 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify the length of service an employee of the Legislature whose term of employment is otherwise classified as temporary and who is employed to perform services required by the Legislature for its regular sessions must serve to obtain service credit towards retirement.
Title
Modifying length of service for certain employees to obtain credit for retirement
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Sen. Mark Hunt [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-24 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 243) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 243) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 243) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | To House Finance |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 243) |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 243) |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Amended on 3rd reading (Voice vote) |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2024-02-13 | Senate | To Pensions |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-13 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 10 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |