WV SB781 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 143, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 143, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Summary
Relating to service of suggestee execution and notice
Title
Relating to service of suggestee execution and notice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 143, Acts, Regular Session, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-27 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/18/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/18/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-18 | To Governor 3/18/08 | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-07 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-07 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-07 | Passed House (Roll No. 443) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-03-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-06 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-05 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-05 | Do pass | |
2008-02-28 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-02-28 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-28 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-27 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-27 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 37) | |
2008-02-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-27 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-25 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-26 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-25 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-02-25 | Committee substitute reported | |
2008-02-21 | Referred to Judiciary | |
2008-02-21 | Motion | |
2008-02-21 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-21 | Reported do pass | |
2008-02-21 | Originating in Senate Finance |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=781&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |