WV SB782 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 70, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 70, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to define local permitting deadlines and extensions for applications for a permit, license, variance, or any other type of prior approval from a governing body or planning commission of a municipality or county for an action related to the development or improvement of property.
Title
Defining deadlines for local permits and extensions for property development or improvement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 460) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 244) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 244) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 70, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/11/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/11/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-04 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 460) |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | Do pass |
2024-02-26 | House | To House Economic Development and Tourism |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 244) |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-02-14 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-14 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8A | 13 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8A | 13 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8A | 13 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8A | 13 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |