WV SB80 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 116, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 116, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing for administration of certain small estates by affidavit and without appointment of personal representative
Title
Allowing for administration of certain small estates by affidavit and without appointment of personal representative
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 402) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 40) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 40) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 116, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 |
2021-04-07 | House | To Governor 4/7/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-07 | Senate | To Governor 4/7/21 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-02 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 402) |
2021-04-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-31 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-01 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 40) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
44 | 1 | 28 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
44 | 1A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 1A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 1A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 1A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 1A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |