WV SB82 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 246, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 246, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Including rebuttable presumptions in certain cases for firefighters with regard to workers' compensation
Title
Including rebuttable presumptions in certain cases for firefighters with regard to workers' compensation
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 438) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 205) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 205) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 246, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 438) |
2018-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Do pass |
2018-02-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 205) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-10 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 4 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |