WV SB838 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-23 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-23 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to mandate lending institutions who conduct five or more transactions annually to utilize the Division of Motor Vehicles electronic lien system to perfect or release security interest in a vehicle.
Title
Requiring lending institutions to utilize DMV electronic lien system under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 216) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 216) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 216) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | House | To House Government Organization |
2024-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 216) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 216) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-02-16 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-16 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 4A | 2A | Amended Code | Citation Text |