WY HB0018 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; prohibiting law enforcement from assisting the federal government in investigating, arresting and prosecuting persons taking or injuring gray wolves or grizzly bears as specified; providing exceptions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wolves and grizzly bears-limited state action.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0- (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 40-19-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 40-19-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 40-19-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 40-19-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0- |
2016-02-19 | House | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 40-19-1-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/HB0018.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Introduced/HB0018.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/HB0018.pdf |