WY HB0023 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Assigned Chapter Number 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Assigned Chapter Number 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; confirming the ability of county treasurers to provide vehicle certificates of registration in electronic form as specified; amending requirements for the display of vehicle registrations, license plates, validation stickers and permits as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Vehicle registration e-certificate and grace period.
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Larson [R] | Rep. Tony Niemiec [R] | Rep. Cody Wylie [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Sen. Stacy Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 56-5-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 56-5-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Assigned Chapter Number 20 | |
2024-03-04 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0008 | |
2024-02-29 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0008 |
2024-02-28 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0008 |
2024-02-28 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0008 | |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-26 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-23 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-21 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-20 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-19 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-02-16 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 56-5-1-0-0 |
2024-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-12-21 | Bill Number Assigned |