WY HB0024 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicle registration; specifying which vehicles must be registered; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Insurance requirements for newly purchased vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Cohee [R] | Sen. Floyd Esquibel [D] | Rep. Mike Gilmore [D] | Rep. Timothy Hallinan [R] |
Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Rep. James Petersen [R] | Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2010-03-04 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0011 | |
2010-03-02 | (S) President Signed HEA No. 0011 | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0011 | |
2010-02-26 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0011 | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-25 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-24 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-23 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-23 | (S08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S08 | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-15 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-12 | (H08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H08 | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-01-06 | Bill Number Assigned |