WY HB0027 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard Nayes: Senator(s) Coe, Jennings, Landen and Rothfuss Ayes 1 Nays 4 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard Nayes: Senator(s) Coe, Jennings, Landen and Rothfuss Ayes 1 Nays 4 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; modifying the minimum school year contact hours as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School year-required contact hours.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard Nayes: Senator(s) Coe, Jennings, Landen and Rothfuss Ayes 1 Nays 4 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-03-02 | (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c) | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S04; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-27 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-25 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Bonner, Brechtel, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Gay, Gingery, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Illoway, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, McKim, Miller, Nicholas B, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Botten, Connolly, Craft, Freeman, Greear, Hunt, Jaggi, Madden, McOmie, Moniz, Patton, Peasley, Semlek, Vranish and Wallis. Excused: Representative(s) Davison and Goggles. Ayes 40 Nays 18 Excused 2 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Rereferred to HGF | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2011-01-17 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-17 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Brechtel, Burkhart, Connolly, Krone, Loucks and Teeters Nayes: Representative(s) Freeman, Kroeker and Madden Ayes 6 Nays 3 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-17 | (H04) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04 | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-12-14 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0027.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0027.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Engross/HB0027.pdf |