WY HB0041 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the emergency medical technician pension plan; providing for funding of plan from fire insurance premium taxes; amending obsolete and inconsistent language; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Emergency medical technician pension plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - S Failed 3rd Reading (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H02 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H02 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Failed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed CoW |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-12 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 |
2014-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-01-13 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0041.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/HB0041.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0041.htm |