WY HB0063 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Assigned Chapter Number 109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Assigned Chapter Number 109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; amending the salary for county attorneys and county and prosecuting attorneys; amending the salary for district attorneys; amending the state contribution to counties for the salaries of county and prosecuting attorneys; and providing for an effective date.
Title
County and district attorneys-salary amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - Concur:Passed 48-9-1-0-2 (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-19-1-0-2 (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 41-16-1-0-2 (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-19-1-0-2 (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 41-16-1-0-2 (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Assigned Chapter Number 109 | |
2022-03-25 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0047 | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0047 |
2022-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0047 |
2022-03-10 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0047 | |
2022-03-10 | House | Concur:Passed 48-9-1-0-2 |
2022-03-10 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-07 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-02 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 38-19-1-0-2 |
2022-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-18 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 41-16-1-0-2 |
2022-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-04 | Bill Number Assigned |