WY HB0064 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public funds; amending or eliminating unnecessary or obsolete borrowing authority or guarantees from the legislative stabilization reserve account as specified; repealing interfund loan authority for the unemployment compensation fund; repealing borrowing authority for the department of administration and information for purposes of school districts joining the state employees' and officials' group insurance plan; amending the source and amount of loans for the department of transportation as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Legislative stabilization reserve account-obligations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0064JC001: 25-0-6-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0064JC001: 55-0-7-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Concur:Failed 20-41-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0064JC001: 55-0-7-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Concur:Failed 20-41-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number 165 | |
2023-03-09 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0095 | |
2023-03-03 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0095 |
2023-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0095 |
2023-03-03 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0095 | |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2023-02-23 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2023-02-23 | House | Concur:Failed 20-41-1-0-0 |
2023-02-23 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-17 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 |
2023-01-27 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-24 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |