WY HB0082 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to veterans benefits and exemptions; allowing veterans to be considered honorably discharged if discharged solely for refusing a COVID-19 vaccine as specified; providing a definition; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Military discharge and benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number 41 | |
2022-03-09 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0033 | |
2022-03-07 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0033 |
2022-03-07 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0033 |
2022-03-07 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0033 | |
2022-03-07 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-03 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-03 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 |
2022-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-22 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 55-4-1-0-0 |
2022-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-08 | Bill Number Assigned |