WY HB0105 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; reducing the severance tax rate for surface coal; conforming related tax distribution provisions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Severance tax reduction-coal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Adopted HB0105JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Adopted HB0105JC001: 46-12-2-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Concur:Failed 23-36-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Amendment failed 2-27-1-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-04 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Adopted HB0105JC001: 46-12-2-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Concur:Failed 23-36-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Amendment failed 2-27-1-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-04 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Assigned Chapter Number 102 | |
2022-03-21 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0060 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0060 |
2022-03-11 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0060 |
2022-03-11 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0060 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2022-03-10 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2022-03-10 | House | Concur:Failed 23-36-1-0-0 |
2022-03-10 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-04 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-03-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0 |
2022-02-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-23 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-22 | House | H03 - Revenue:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2022-02-22 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 44-15-1-0-0 |
2022-02-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |