WY HB0107 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-17 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-17 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to trade and commerce; prohibiting filling of liquefied petroleum gas containers without the owner's permission; providing for marking of liquefied petroleum gas containers; providing penalties; providing a definition; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Unlawful use of liquefied gas containers.
Sponsors
Rep. Marti Halverson [R] | Rep. Keith Gingery [R] | Rep. Ruth Petroff [R] | Sen. Leland Christensen [R] |
Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-17 - House - H Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 12 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2013-01-16 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-17 | House | Failed CoW; Indef Postponed |
2013-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-16 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 |
2013-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-08 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0107.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0107.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0107.htm |