WY HB0108 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Chapter No. 145 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Chapter No. 145 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to property; specifying the duty of care a landowner owes to a trespasser; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Trespass-landowner liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Chapter No. 145 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-10 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0089 | |
2015-03-03 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0089 |
2015-03-02 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0089 |
2015-03-02 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0089 | |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-02-25 | Senate | COW Passed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-25 | Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-04 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 |
2015-02-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-02 | House | COW Passed |
2015-01-29 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-29 | Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2015-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |