WY HB0116 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to educational programs for public schools; eliminating foreign language instruction as a component of the required state educational program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Elementary foreign language instruction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2011-01-13 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0116.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0116.pdf |