WY HB0122 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to professions and occupations; providing for the licensing of anesthesiologist assistants and specifying scope of practice; creating and amending definitions; creating an advisory committee to the board of medicine; providing for temporary licenses as specified; providing for the imposition of fees; providing for the suspension, restriction, revocation or nonrenewal of licenses as specified; providing for license reinstatement; creating a criminal penalty; providing for a hearing; requiring rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Anesthesiologist assistants licensing.
Sponsors
Rep. Dalton Banks [R] | Rep. Ryan Berger [R] | Rep. Clark Stith [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
Sen. Stephan Pappas [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis Schuler [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-27 - House - H10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2023-02-07 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-01-27 | House | H10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2023-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |