WY HB0131 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to environmental quality; amending and repealing requirements and conditions for legislative approval of the siting of high-level radioactive waste storage facilities as specified; amending provisions for small modular nuclear reactors to apply to advanced nuclear reactors; specifying duties and requirements for advanced nuclear reactors; defining terms; amending definitions, requirements and exemptions related to cost recovery for specified electric generation facilities; amending exemptions for the nuclear electricity production tax; making conforming amendments; repealing nuclear reactor requirements as specified; requiring rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Nuclear power generation and storage-amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Burkhart [R] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Sen. James Anderson [R] |
Sen. Edward Cooper [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - Concur:Passed 43-15-2-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Amendment failed 12-17-1-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Amendment failed 25-34-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 47-12-1-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Amendment failed 12-17-1-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Amendment failed 25-34-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 47-12-1-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Assigned Chapter Number 103 | |
2022-03-21 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0059 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0059 |
2022-03-11 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0059 |
2022-03-11 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0059 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Concur:Passed 43-15-2-0-0 |
2022-03-10 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-1-0-0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-08 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-03-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 45-14-1-0-0 |
2022-02-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2022-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-22 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 47-12-1-0-0 |
2022-02-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-15 | Bill Number Assigned |