WY HB0141 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the collection of debts due the state or other governmental entities; providing a fee for collection costs when the state or governmental entity employs a collection agency to recover debts due the state; amending existing statutes; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Collection costs for debts owed to the state.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Burkhart [R] | Rep. Michael Madden [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Curt Meier [R] |
Sen. Ray Peterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H09 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2014-02-21 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2014-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 |
2014-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0141.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/HB0141.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0141.htm |