WY HB0149 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-31 - 3rd Reading:Failed 28-34-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-31 - 3rd Reading:Failed 28-34-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; creating the offenses of assault, threat of violence and battery against health care providers; specifying penalties; providing definitions; establishing duties and requirements of health care facilities to address violence against health care providers; making conforming amendments; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Protection of health care workers.
Sponsors
Rep. Forrest Chadwick [R] | Rep. Kenneth Clouston [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Evie Brennan [R] |
Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis Schuler [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 28-34-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-25 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-31 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 28-34-0-0-0 |
2023-01-30 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-25 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2023-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |