WY HB0185 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; providing a sales and use tax exemption for the purchase of a motor vehicle which operates on natural gas as specified; providing a sunset date; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tax exemption for natural gas powered vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Petroff [R] | Rep. Donald Burkhart [R] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] |
Sen. Leland Christensen [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - House - H Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2013-02-04 | House | Introduced and referred to H03; No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 |
2013-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0185.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0185.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0185.htm |