WY HB0208 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to off-road vehicles; exempting off-road vehicles operated for agricultural purposes from registration requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Off-road vehicle registration-exemption.
Sponsors
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Rep. John Eklund [R] | Sen. John Schiffer [R] | Sen. Charles Scott [R] |
Rep. Lisa Shepperson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-03-03 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0084 | |
2011-03-02 | (S) President Signed HEA No. 0084 | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0084 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0084 | |
2011-03-01 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-28 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-25 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-17 | (S08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S08 | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-04 | (H08) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H08 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |