WY HB0275 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public funds; providing for the distribution of net realized capital gains from investments of the permanent Wyoming mineral trust fund as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Permanent Wyoming mineral trust fund-capital gains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2019-02-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-01 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2019-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-28 | Bill Number Assigned |