WY HB0298 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to cities and towns; granting to cities and towns the authority to fund surface water drainage systems by service charges as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Surface water drainage systems-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-02-01 | House | H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2019-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-28 | Bill Number Assigned |