WY SF0008 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of the government; specifying duties for the division of criminal investigation, Wyoming office of homeland security, division of victim services, highway patrol and others in the reporting, investigation, emergency alert and recovery of missing persons and other offenses; requiring state cooperation with federal, tribal and local law enforcement for alert systems and investigation and resolution of criminal activity; requiring reports; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Missing and murdered indigenous persons-agency cooperation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number 19 | |
2020-03-09 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0005 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0005 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0005 |
2020-03-04 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0005 | |
2020-03-04 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 |
2020-03-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-28 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2020-02-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-17 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-12-10 | Bill Number Assigned |