WY SF0009 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Assigned Chapter Number 105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Assigned Chapter Number 105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to revenue bonds; authorizing the Wyoming business council to issue revenue bonds as specified for agriculture processing projects; specifying that municipal, county and joint powers board industrial development projects and purposes include agricultural and agricultural-related projects; limiting bond eligibility; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Revenue bonds for agricultural endeavors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Concur:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Assigned Chapter Number 105 | |
2022-03-22 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0021 | |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0021 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0021 |
2022-03-08 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0021 | |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Concur:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2022-03-07 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 |
2022-03-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-03 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-03-02 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2022-02-21 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-18 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-02-16 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 23-7-0-0-0 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-12-20 | Bill Number Assigned |