WY SF0025 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number 48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number 48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to defense forces and affairs; allowing use of federal burial reimbursement funds for operations and maintenance expenses at the state veterans' cemetery; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Veterans cemetery-use of funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | Assigned Chapter Number 48 | |
2019-02-18 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0021 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0021 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0021 |
2019-02-13 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0021 | |
2019-02-13 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-11 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-08 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2019-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-14 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-10 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-10 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-18 | Bill Number Assigned |