WY SF0054 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-22 - Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-22 - Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages; expanding current special malt beverage permits provisions to include sales of wine; changing the name of special malt beverage permits to reflect the sale of wine; providing conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Limited alcoholic beverage permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-22 - Senate - S Failed 3rd Reading (Y: 6 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-22 | Senate | Failed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Rereferred to S06 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-27 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/SF0054.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/SF0054.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/SF0054.htm |