WY SF0054 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; codifying funding formulas and standards related to appropriations to local governments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Appropriations to local governments- codification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-19 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2016-02-19 | Senate | COW |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-19 | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-1-0-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-01-27 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/SF0054.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Introduced/SF0054.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/SF0054.pdf |