WY SF0083 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the revision of statutes and other legislative enactments; correcting statutory references and language resulting from inadvertent errors and omissions in previously adopted legislation; amending obsolete references; repealing an obsolete provision; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Revisor's bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-7-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 30-1-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-7-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 30-1-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 82 | |
2024-03-15 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0063 | |
2024-03-08 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0063 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0063 |
2024-03-08 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0063 | |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Concur:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2024-03-07 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-7-0-0-0 |
2024-03-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2024-03-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-03-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-02-29 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-02-29 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2024-02-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-20 | Senate | S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 30-1-0-0-0 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |